AZ HB2272 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Chapter 168
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Chapter 168
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Tax credits; capital investments; employment
Title
Tax credits; capital investments; employment
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Forese [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Energy and Military Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Energy and Military Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Chapter 168 | |
2014-04-23 | Governor Signed | |
2014-04-23 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-22 | House | House final reading , voting: (38-21-1-0) |
2014-04-22 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2014-04-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-4-2-0) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0) |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate CEM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-2-0) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate CEM Committee |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CEM Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-03-17 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-03-17 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (42-14-3-0) |
2014-03-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2014-02-27 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-27 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-17 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-2-0-2-0) |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to House WM Committee |
2014-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |