AZ HB2266 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-21 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-21 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Board of cosmetology; continuation
Title
Board of cosmetology; continuation
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Forese [R] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D] | Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Sen. Linda Gray [R] | Rep. David Livingston [R] | Rep. Steve Montenegro [R] | Rep. Franklin Pratt [R] |
Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Energy and Military Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Energy and Military Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-5-7-0) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate CEM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate CEM Committee |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CEM Committee |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-02-11 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-02-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (52-7-1-0) |
2014-02-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-1-0) |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred to House COM Committee |
2014-01-28 | House | House read second time |
2014-01-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-27 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2014-01-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |