AZ HB2179 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Chapter 259
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Chapter 259
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Trampoline court safety
Title
Trampoline court safety
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 15 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | Chapter 259 | |
2014-04-30 | Governor Signed | |
2014-04-24 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-23 | House | House final reading , voting: (38-15-7-0) |
2014-04-23 | House | House Concurrence FAILED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2014-04-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-8-7-0) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate PS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-1-2-0) |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate PS Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate PS Committee |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-03-05 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (44-14-2-0) |
2014-03-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-02-27 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-27 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-18 | House | House GOV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-1-0-0-0) |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to House GOV Committee |
2014-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |