AZ HB2166 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Senate ELEC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Senate ELEC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Statewide voter registration database; costs
Title
Statewide voter registration database; costs
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Dunn [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate ELEC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-22 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-1-0) |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-31 | House | House MOE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2024-01-17 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned to House MOE Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-01-08 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Conditional Enactment
Costs
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Registration Rolls
Statewide Voter Registration Database
Costs
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Registration Rolls
Statewide Voter Registration Database