AZ HB2082 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Status: Engrossed on February 5 2013 - 50% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-11 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (11-16-3-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Lottery prizewinners; confidentiality

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lottery prizewinners; confidentiality

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 11 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-27 - Senate Commerce, Energy and Military Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-11SenateSenate third reading FAILED voting: (11-16-3-0)
2013-03-18SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2013-03-05SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2013-03-05SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2013-03-04SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2013-02-19SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2013-02-27SenateSenate CEM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0)
2013-02-20SenateReferred to Senate CEM Committee
2013-02-20SenateSenate read second time
2013-02-19SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2013-02-19SenateAssigned to Senate CEM Committee
2013-02-19SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2013-02-05HouseTransmit to Senate
2013-02-05HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (51-8-1-0)
2013-01-29HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2013-01-29HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2013-01-28HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0)
2013-01-17HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2013-01-22HouseHouse GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-0-0-0)
2013-01-22HouseReferred to House GOV Committee
2013-01-22HouseHouse read second time
2013-01-17HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2013-01-17HouseAssigned to House GOV Committee
2013-01-17HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback