AZ HB2020 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Chapter 91
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Chapter 91
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; child care; reduced fees
Title
Schools; child care; reduced fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | Chapter 91 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-03-17 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-1-1-0) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-0) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-01-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (41-17-2-0) |
2021-01-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-01-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-01-25 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-01-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-12 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-12 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-2-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-11 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-12-21 | House | Prefile |