AZ HB2012 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Chapter 61
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Chapter 61
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of forestry; continuation
Title
Department of forestry; continuation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Chapter 61 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-03-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-3-1-0) |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-2-0) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-22 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (47-11-1-0) |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-12 | House | House LARA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-31 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to House LARA Committee |
2024-01-30 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-11-20 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Continuation
Department Of Forestry
Forestry And Fire Management
Purpose
Repeal
Retroactivity
State Government - Title 41
Department Of Forestry
Forestry And Fire Management
Purpose
Repeal
Retroactivity
State Government - Title 41
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 1302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3024.21 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3032.21 | New Code | See Bill Text |