AR SB731 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Establish A Right Of Privacy Concerning Coronavirus 2019 (covid-19) Vaccination Status; To Establish A Grant Program From Covid-19 Relief Funds Or American Rescue Plan Act Of 2021 Funds; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Establish A Right Of Privacy Concerning Coronavirus 2019 (covid-19) Vaccination Status; To Establish A Grant Program From Covid-19 Relief Funds Or American Rescue Plan Act Of 2021 Funds; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 46 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-10-08 - House - Decision of Chair is sustained (Y: 49 N: 32 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-10-08 - House - Motion to sustain ruling of the chair passed-referred to Rules Committee. (Y: 51 N: 36 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-08 - House - Decision of Chair is sustained (Y: 49 N: 32 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-10-08 - House - Motion to sustain ruling of the chair passed-referred to Rules Committee. (Y: 51 N: 36 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2021-10-08 | Senate | Returned From the House as Failed to Pass |
2021-10-08 | House | Returned To the Senate having failed to pass. |
2021-10-08 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2021-10-08 | House | Motion for immediate consideration of SB731 passed |
2021-10-08 | House | Decision of Chair is sustained |
2021-10-08 | House | Motion immediate consideration passed |
2021-10-08 | House | Motion shall the decision of the Chair stand the judgement of the House |
2021-10-08 | House | Rules Committee disagreed with Speaker's ruling |
2021-10-08 | House | Motion to sustain ruling of the chair passed-referred to Rules Committee. |
2021-10-08 | House | Motion for Immediate Consideration of Rep. Bryant's motion passed. |
2021-10-08 | House | Rep. Bryant made motion to sustain ruling of sending to Rules Committee. |
2021-10-08 | House | Rep. Wardlaw objected to the germaneness of bill to HCR1015 and objected to ruling and appeal decision to ruling and referred to Rules Committee. |
2021-10-07 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-10-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-10-07 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-10-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-10-07 | Senate | Emergency Clause failed of adoption. |
2021-10-07 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-10-07 | Senate | Motion for Immediate Consideration. Motion carried. |
2021-10-01 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Filed |