AR SB460 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Regulating Private Investigators And Private Security Agencies; To Amend License Requirements; And To Establish Minimum Requirements For Private Investigator Instructors.
Title
To Amend The Law Regulating Private Investigators And Private Security Agencies; To Amend License Requirements; And To Establish Minimum Requirements For Private Investigator Instructors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | House | Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment |
2021-04-22 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2021-04-22 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-04-12 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Filed |