AR SB188 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Polling Places; And To Amend The Law Concerning Electioneering.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Polling Places; And To Amend The Law Concerning Electioneering.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Clark [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 37 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | House | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment |
2021-03-15 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2021-02-24 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-02-08 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2021-02-08 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Filed |