AR SB1075 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Alternative Fuels Tax Law; To Amend The Excise Tax Levied On Alternative Fuels; To Create A Fair And Equitable Method Of Maintaining The Roads In The State; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend The Alternative Fuels Tax Law; To Amend The Excise Tax Levied On Alternative Fuels; To Create A Fair And Equitable Method Of Maintaining The Roads In The State; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Jake Files [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-05 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 50 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - House - Rep. Wardlaw, J served notice that he will within the time prescribed move to reconsider the vote by which SB1075 Failed to Pass - 04/05/2013 01:16:30 PM (Y: 60 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 50 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - House - Rep. Wardlaw, J served notice that he will within the time prescribed move to reconsider the vote by which SB1075 Failed to Pass - 04/05/2013 01:16:30 PM (Y: 60 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 50 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2013-05-17 | House | Returned to the Senate. |
2013-05-17 | House | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-04-05 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2013-04-05 | House | Rep. Wardlaw, J served notice that he will within the time prescribed move to reconsider the vote by which SB1075 Failed to Pass - 04/05/2013 01:16:30 PM |
2013-04-04 | House | Clincher Motion failed of adoption. |
2013-04-04 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2013-04-02 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-27 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2013-03-26 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2013-03-14 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Filed |