AR HB1703 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in House at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in House at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Alternative Fuels Tax Law; To Amend The Excise Tax Levied On Alternative Fuels; To Create A Fair And Equitable Method Of Maintaining The Roads In The State; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend The Alternative Fuels Tax Law; To Amend The Excise Tax Levied On Alternative Fuels; To Create A Fair And Equitable Method Of Maintaining The Roads In The State; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Douglas [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 43 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | House | Died in House at Sine Die adjournment. |
2015-03-20 | House | Clincher motion failed of adoption. |
2015-03-20 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2015-03-18 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-18 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-17 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2015-03-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2015-03-06 | House | Filed |