AR HB1700 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Notification that HB1700 is now Act 746
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Notification that HB1700 is now Act 746
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Making Technical Corrections Concerning The Possession Of A Handgun And Other Weapons In Certain Places.
Title
Making Technical Corrections Concerning The Possession Of A Handgun And Other Weapons In Certain Places.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Altes [R] | Sen. Jake Files [R] | Sen. Alan Clark [R] | Rep. Randy Alexander [R] |
Sen. Bryan King [R] | Sen. Bob Ballinger [R] | Rep. Jonathan Barnett [R] | Rep. Nate Bell [R] |
Rep. Kenneth Bragg [R] | Rep. Charlotte Douglas [R] | Rep. Les Carnine [R] | Rep. Bruce Cozart [R] |
Rep. Robert Dale [R] | Rep. Gary Deffenbaugh [R] | Sen. Kim Hammer [R] | Rep. Debra Hobbs [R] |
Sen. Jon Woods [R] | Rep. Andrea Lea [R] | Sen. Terry Rice [R] | Rep. Stephen Meeks [R] |
Rep. Sue Scott [R] | Rep. Bruce Westerman [R] | Rep. James Word [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 82 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 82 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | House | Notification that HB1700 is now Act 746 |
2013-04-03 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-02 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-02 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-03-26 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-21 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-20 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-20 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-12 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-12 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-12 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-06 | House | Filed |