AL SB72 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Elections, voter registration lists, publication by judge of probate on website of co. or Association of Co. Commissioners website, comp., Secs. 17-4-1, 17-4-10, 17-9-5 am'd.
Title
Elections, voter registration lists, publication by judge of probate on website of co. or Association of Co. Commissioners website, comp., Secs. 17-4-1, 17-4-10, 17-9-5 am'd.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Figures motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections Amendment Offered |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Reported from Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections as Favorable with 1 amendment |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections |