AL SB55 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Personnel Department, to require director to regularly assess job requirements and remove college degree when practicable
Title
Personnel Department, to require director to regularly assess job requirements and remove college degree when practicable
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - Senate - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-02-15 | House | Pending House State Government |
2024-02-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on State Government |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 54 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Pending Senate State Governmental Affairs |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on State Governmental Affairs |