AL SB469 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1132
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1132
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fair Campaign Practices Act, certain reporting excluded, civil penalties authorized by Secretary of State, probate judges, administrative rules authorized, administrative review of contested fines, Secs. 17-5-19.1, 17-5-19.2, 17-5-21 added; Secs. 17-5-8, 17-5-19 am'd.
Title
Fair Campaign Practices Act, certain reporting excluded, civil penalties authorized by Secretary of State, probate judges, administrative rules authorized, administrative review of contested fines, Secs. 17-5-19.1, 17-5-19.2, 17-5-21 added; Secs. 17-5-8, 17-5-19 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Taylor motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Taylor motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Taylor motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Taylor motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1132 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Taylor motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1131 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Taylor Amendment Offered |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Taylor motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1130 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections Amendment Offered |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Taylor motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections |