AL SB336 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Research and Development Corridors; establishment of by counties and Class 1 municipalities as public corporation authorized; provide for the powers of research and development corridors.
Title
Research and Development Corridors; establishment of by counties and Class 1 municipalities as public corporation authorized; provide for the powers of research and development corridors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 735 (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt - Roll Call 734 UFF5GDD-1 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt - Roll Call 733 NKAYJJJ-1 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt - Roll Call 734 UFF5GDD-1 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt - Roll Call 733 NKAYJJJ-1 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-30 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-25 | House | Pending House Economic Development and Tourism |
2024-04-25 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Economic Development and Tourism |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 735 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 734 UFF5GDD-1 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Waggoner 1st Amendment Offered UFF5GDD-1 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 733 NKAYJJJ-1 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Waggoner 1st Substitute Offered NKAYJJJ-1 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Table - Adopted Voice Vote XTBHEZZ-1 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | County and Municipal Government 1st Substitute Offered XTBHEZZ-1 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-23 | Senate | County and Municipal Government 1st Substitute XTBHEZZ-1 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Pending Senate County and Municipal Government |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on County and Municipal Government |