AL SB328 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Community development districts, additional criteria for establishment of district on impounded reservoir created by river from wilderness area, sale of alcoholic beverages authorized
Title
Community development districts, additional criteria for establishment of district on impounded reservoir created by river from wilderness area, sale of alcoholic beverages authorized
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 866 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt - Roll Call 865 Y3ASNN2-1 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt - Roll Call 865 Y3ASNN2-1 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-05-01 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-30 | House | Pending House Economic Development and Tourism |
2024-04-30 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Economic Development and Tourism |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Engrossed |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 866 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 865 Y3ASNN2-1 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development 1st Substitute Offered Y3ASNN2-1 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development 1st Substitute Y3ASNN2-1 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Pending Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |