AL SB206 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Assigned Act No. 2016-318.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Assigned Act No. 2016-318.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Physician's Assistants Service Program, created, administered by the Board of Medical Scholarship Awards, funding of program, tax credits for participation
Title
Physician's Assistants Service Program, created, administered by the Board of Medical Scholarship Awards, funding of program, tax credits for participation
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Melson [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2016-318. |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-05-03 | House | Signature Requested |
2016-05-03 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 898 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2016-04-28 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 806 |
2016-04-28 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 805 |
2016-04-28 | House | Ways and Means Education Amendment Offered |
2016-04-28 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-04-13 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2016-03-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 383 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Melson motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 382 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Melson Amendment Offered |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Melson motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 381 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Melson motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |