AL SB186 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Schools, students taught at home by either private tutor or under church school law may participate in public K-12 extracurricular activities, Tim Tebow Act
Title
Schools, students taught at home by either private tutor or under church school law may participate in public K-12 extracurricular activities, Tim Tebow Act
Sponsors
Sen. Shadrack McGill [R] | Sen. Rusty Glover [R] | Sen. Bryan Taylor [R] | Sen. Dick Brewbaker [R] |
Sen. Trip Pittman [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-24 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 10 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-04-24 - Senate - McGill motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Motion to Miscellaneous (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 11 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2013-04-24 - Senate - McGill motion to Table (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2013-04-24 - Senate - McGill motion to Adopt (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - McGill motion to Table (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - McGill motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Motion to Miscellaneous (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 11 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2013-04-24 - Senate - McGill motion to Table (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2013-04-24 - Senate - McGill motion to Adopt (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - McGill motion to Table (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Marsh motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Marsh to reconsider third reading adopted Voice Vote |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Marsh to reconsider vote by which it lost adopted Voice Vote |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 538 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | McGill motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 537 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Rules Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 536 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Williams motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 535 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Williams Amendment Offered |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Dial motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 534 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | McGill motion to Table lost Roll Call 533 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Dial first Substitute Offered |
2013-04-24 | Senate | McGill motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 532 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | McGill Amendment Offered |
2013-04-24 | Senate | McGill first Substitute Offered |
2013-04-24 | Senate | McGill motion to Table adopted Roll Call 531 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Education Amendment Offered |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education |