AL SB137 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Alabama Board of Massage Therapy, terminated pursuant to the Sunset law and replaced by the Alabama Massage Therapy Licensing Board
Title
Alabama Board of Massage Therapy, terminated pursuant to the Sunset law and replaced by the Alabama Massage Therapy Licensing Board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Senate - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Gudger substitution 1M6SZ33-1 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Gudger substitution 1M6SZ33-1 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-24 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House from House Boards, Agencies and Commissions J26ZYFY-1 |
2024-04-24 | House | Boards, Agencies and Commissions 1st Amendment NKMN8J8-1 |
2024-04-24 | House | Boards, Agencies and Commissions 1st Substitute E43R222-1 |
2024-03-05 | House | Engrossed |
2024-03-05 | House | Pending House Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2024-03-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 145 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Gudger motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 144 1M6SZ33-1 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | FRED Substitute Offered 1M6SZ33-1 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted 1M6SZ33-1 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Pending Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |