AL HJR315 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 67-37)
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Forwarded to Governor on March 18, 2014 at 6:03 p.m. on March 18, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 67-37)
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Forwarded to Governor on March 18, 2014 at 6:03 p.m. on March 18, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Parker High School Basketball Team, commended
Title
Parker High School Basketball Team, commended
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Forwarded to Governor on March 18, 2014 at 6:03 p.m. on March 18, 2014. |
2014-03-18 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-205. |
2014-03-18 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-03-18 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-03-18 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2014-03-11 | House | Givan motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-11 | House | Introduced |