AL HJR16 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-13 - Forwarded to Governor on February 13, 2014 at 11:21 a.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-13 - Forwarded to Governor on February 13, 2014 at 11:21 a.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Johnson, James Wade, commended
Title
Johnson, James Wade, commended
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-13 | House | Forwarded to Governor on February 13, 2014 at 11:21 a.m. |
2014-02-13 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-18. |
2014-02-13 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-13 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-02-13 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |
2014-02-06 | House | Johnson (R) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-06 | House | Reported from Rules |
2014-01-14 | House | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |