AL HB600 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Delivered to Governor at 1:35 p.m. on April 13, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Delivered to Governor at 1:35 p.m. on April 13, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health Department, cancer, programs for breast, cervical, and colorectal cancer awareness, establishment required
Title
Health Department, cancer, programs for breast, cervical, and colorectal cancer awareness, establishment required
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Delivered to Governor at 1:35 p.m. on April 13, 2010. | |
2010-04-13 | Assigned Act No. 2010-587. | |
2010-04-13 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-04-13 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-08 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-08 | Passed Second House | |
2010-04-08 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 880 | |
2010-04-08 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-03-30 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health | |
2010-03-30 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 708 | |
2010-03-03 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-03-30 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-18 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |