AL HB552 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 2:11 p.m. on March 25, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 2:11 p.m. on March 25, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Macon Co., court costs, certain costs earmarked for county jail not pledged for county jail authorized to be used for roads and bridges, Amendment 530 (Section 4, Local Amendments, Macon County, Recompiled Constitution of Alabama of 1901, as amended) am'd., const. amend.
Title
Macon Co., court costs, certain costs earmarked for county jail not pledged for county jail authorized to be used for roads and bridges, Amendment 530 (Section 4, Local Amendments, Macon County, Recompiled Constitution of Alabama of 1901, as amended) am'd., const. amend.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Delivered to Secretary of State at 2:11 p.m. on March 25, 2010. | |
2010-03-25 | Assigned Act No. 2010-231. | |
2010-03-25 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-03-25 | Signature Requested | |
2010-03-25 | Enrolled | |
2010-03-25 | Passed Second House | |
2010-03-25 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 587 | |
2010-03-25 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-23 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-25 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2010-02-17 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 284 | |
2010-02-17 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-16 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-11 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |