AL HB547 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Contractors, public works contracts, timely payments, contractor required to timely pay a subcontractor for work completed, Sec. 8-29-3 am'd.
Title
Contractors, public works contracts, timely payments, contractor required to timely pay a subcontractor for work completed, Sec. 8-29-3 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability |
2014-03-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 759 |
2014-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-05 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-26 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business |