AL HB502 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-04-01 - Forwarded to Governor on April 1, 2014 at 8:52 p.m. on April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorities formed to develop former military installations, competitive bids, requirement that authority bid contracts removed, Sec.11-92B-24 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorities formed to develop former military installations, competitive bids, requirement that authority bid contracts removed, Sec.11-92B-24 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-02 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Marsh motion to Table (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-01HouseForwarded to Governor on April 1, 2014 at 8:52 p.m. on April 1, 2014.
2014-04-01HouseAssigned Act No. 2014-342.
2014-04-01HouseClerk of the House Certification
2014-04-01HouseEnrolled
2014-04-01SenateSignature Requested
2014-04-01HousePassed Second House
2014-04-01SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1114
2014-04-01SenateMarsh motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1113
2014-04-01SenateFiscal Responsibility and Accountability Amendment Offered
2014-04-01SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-03-13SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2014-03-06SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability
2014-03-05HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 552
2014-03-05HouseThird Reading Passed
2014-02-26HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-02-18HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback