AL HB426 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sex offenders, sex offender convicted of crime with a minor prohibited within 500 feet of public school K-12 property during instructional hours, Class C felony, Sec. 15-20A-17 am'd.
Title
Sex offenders, sex offender convicted of crime with a minor prohibited within 500 feet of public school K-12 property during instructional hours, Class C felony, Sec. 15-20A-17 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Judiciary |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2014-03-13 | House | Engrossed |
2014-03-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 793 |
2014-03-13 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 792 |
2014-03-13 | House | Judiciary first Substitute Offered |
2014-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-04 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2014-02-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |