AL HB376 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Forwarded to Executive Department
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Forwarded to Executive Department
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Juvenile court, adoptions, exclusive jurisdiction of termination of parental rights cases, Legislative intent, Sec. 12-15-114 am'd.
Title
Juvenile court, adoptions, exclusive jurisdiction of termination of parental rights cases, Legislative intent, Sec. 12-15-114 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Forwarded to Executive Department |
2014-04-03 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-350. |
2014-04-03 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-04-03 | House | Enrolled |
2014-04-03 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1248 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2014-02-27 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 485 |
2014-02-27 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-18 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-30 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |