AL HB364 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on April 16 2013 - 50% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-02 - Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 686
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Mobile Co., county commission to provide for the number and districts for election of members, initial districts to be same as Board of School Commissioners, Act 181, 1957 Reg. Sess. repealed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mobile Co., county commission to provide for the number and districts for election of members, initial districts to be same as Board of School Commissioners, Act 181, 1957 Reg. Sess. repealed

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-03 - Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 70 Abs: 26) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-02SenateBussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 686
2013-05-02SenateSmitherman motion to rerefer
2013-05-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 3
2013-04-16HouseSession intended to vote "Yea"
2013-04-16HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 554
2013-04-16HouseThird Reading Open
2013-03-07HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2013-02-28HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Mobile County Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback