AL HB278 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Delivered to Governor at 10:25 a.m. on May 2, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Delivered to Governor at 10:25 a.m. on May 2, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, fleet vehicles, licensing and registration of, provided, Revenue Dept. required to establish a fleet online tax system, Secs. 40-12-305 to 40-12-309, inclusive, added; Sec. 40-12-240 am'd.
Title
Motor vehicles, fleet vehicles, licensing and registration of, provided, Revenue Dept. required to establish a fleet online tax system, Secs. 40-12-305 to 40-12-309, inclusive, added; Sec. 40-12-240 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:25 a.m. on May 2, 2019. |
2019-05-02 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-129. |
2019-05-02 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-04-30 | House | Enrolled |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 459 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2019-04-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 186 |
2019-04-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |