AL HB166 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Legislature; authority to set and alter compensation of county officers established
Title
Legislature; authority to set and alter compensation of county officers established
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 365 (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-10 | Senate | County and Municipal Government 1st Amendment B9NUJ4J-1 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Pending Senate County and Municipal Government |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on County and Municipal Government |
2024-04-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 365 |
2024-04-02 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-28 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-28 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-14 | House | Pending House State Government |
2024-02-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on State Government |