AK SCR27 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on April 23 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-02 - DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 7/25/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 23 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-02 - DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 7/25/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning House Bill No. 246, adding additional land and water to the Creamer's Field Migratory Waterfowl Refuge.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Hb 246
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-04-20 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | Senate | DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 7/25/14 |
2014-07-02 | Senate | 9:25 AM 7/2 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-04-23 | House | VERSION: SCR 27 |
2014-04-23 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-20 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2014-04-20 | House | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS |
2014-04-20 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |
2014-04-19 | Senate | VERSION: SCR 27 |
2014-04-19 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2014-04-19 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2014-04-19 | Senate | INTRODUCED AND TAKEN UP ON FINAL PASSAGE |