AK SB171 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/5/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/5/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to multidisciplinary child protection teams; and relating to investigation of child abuse or neglect.
Title
Multidisciplinary Child Protection Teams
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to CSSB 171(JUD)? (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-11 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/5/14 |
2014-07-11 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/7 CHAPTER 59 SLA 14 |
2014-07-02 | Senate | 9:25 AM 7/2 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-04-20 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N- |
2014-04-20 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE READ |
2014-04-20 | House | VERSION: HCS CSSB 171(2D JUD) |
2014-04-20 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2014-04-20 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN, MILLETT, JOSEPHSON, TARR |
2014-04-20 | House | PASSED Y38 A2 |
2014-04-20 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 171(2D JUD) |
2014-04-20 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-20 | House | 2D JUD HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-20 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-20 | House | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/20/2014 |
2014-04-13 | House | FN3: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-04-13 | House | FN2: ZERO(LAW) |
2014-04-13 | House | FN1: ZERO(DHS) |
2014-04-13 | House | NR: PRUITT |
2014-04-13 | House | DP: LEDOUX, GRUENBERG, LYNN, KELLER |
2014-04-13 | House | JUD RPT HCS(2D JUD) 4DP 1NR |
2014-04-07 | House | RETURNED TO JUD COMMITTEE |
2014-04-03 | House | FN3: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-04-03 | House | FN2: ZERO(LAW) |
2014-04-03 | House | FN1: ZERO(DHS) |
2014-04-03 | House | NR: PRUITT, GRUENBERG |
2014-04-03 | House | DP: MILLETT, FOSTER, LYNN, LEDOUX, KELLER |
2014-04-03 | House | JUD RPT HCS(JUD) 5DP 2NR |
2014-03-24 | House | JUD |
2014-03-24 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-03-21 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 171(JUD) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N- E2 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | DYSON |
2014-03-21 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): FRENCH, GIESSEL, BISHOP, EGAN, MEYER, STEDMAN, STEVENS, MICCICHE, |
2014-03-21 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 171(JUD) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-03-21 | Senate | JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-03-21 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-03-19 | Senate | HELD TO 3/21 CALENDAR |
2014-03-19 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-07 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(LAW) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DHS) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | NR: WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON |
2014-03-07 | Senate | DP: COGHILL, DYSON |
2014-03-07 | Senate | JUD RPT CS 2DP 2NR SAME TITLE |
2014-02-12 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, GARDNER, ELLIS |
2014-02-12 | Senate | JUD |
2014-02-12 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Administrative Procedure
Attorney General
Child Custody
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Disclosure
Domestic Violence
Executive Branch
Families
Health & Social Services
Law Enforcement
Medical Care
Mental Health
Minors
Public Meetings
Public Records
Subpoenas
Youth Centers
Attorney General
Child Custody
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Disclosure
Domestic Violence
Executive Branch
Families
Health & Social Services
Law Enforcement
Medical Care
Mental Health
Minors
Public Meetings
Public Records
Subpoenas
Youth Centers