AK SB121 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - COSPONSOR(S): CLAMAN
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - COSPONSOR(S): CLAMAN
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the Board of Pharmacy; relating to insurance; relating to pharmacies; relating to pharmacists; relating to pharmacy benefits managers; relating to patient choice of pharmacy; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Pharmacies/pharmacists/benefits Managers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): CLAMAN |
2024-02-08 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): GRAY-JACKSON |
2024-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE |
2024-02-08 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2024-02-08 | Senate | SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED-REFERRALS |
2024-01-16 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): MYERS, TOBIN |
2023-04-05 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): BJORKMAN |
2023-03-31 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2023-03-31 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Boards & Commissions
Business
Consumer Affairs
Contracts
Crimes
Drugs
Fees
Hearings
Hospitals
Insurance
Medical Care
Pharmacists
Rights
Trade Practices
Business
Consumer Affairs
Contracts
Crimes
Drugs
Fees
Hearings
Hospitals
Insurance
Medical Care
Pharmacists
Rights
Trade Practices
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/33?Root=SB121 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/SB0121A.PDF |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/SB0121B.PDF |