AK HJR25 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-11)
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - PERMANENTLY FILED 7/10 LEGIS RESOLVE 69
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-11)
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - PERMANENTLY FILED 7/10 LEGIS RESOLVE 69
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the United States Congress to restore the presumption of a service connection for Agent Orange exposure to United States Veterans who served in the waters defined by and in the airspace over the combat zone in Vietnam; and urging the United States Congress to pass the Toxic Exposure Research and Military Family Support Act of 2013 and to establish a national center for the diagnosis, treatment, and research of health conditions of descendants of veterans exposed to toxic substances.
Title
Veterans: Agent Orange, Toxin Exposure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-17 - House - House: Concur (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House: CSHJR 25(MLV) Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House: CSHJR 25(MLV) Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-11 | House | PERMANENTLY FILED 7/10 LEGIS RESOLVE 69 |
2014-07-01 | House | 2:52 PM 7/1 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-05-30 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2014-04-17 | House | COSPONSOR(S): PRUITT, SADDLER |
2014-04-17 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y40 |
2014-04-17 | House | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 22 |
2014-04-17 | House | CONSIDER CONCUR MESSAGE |
2014-04-16 | House | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS |
2014-04-16 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE READ |
2014-04-15 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHJR 25(STA) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2014-04-15 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2014-04-15 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHJR 25(STA) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-15 | Senate | STA SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-15 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-15 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(H.MLV) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | DP: DYSON, WIELECHOWSKI, GIESSEL |
2014-04-04 | Senate | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 22 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | STA RPT SCS 3DP NEW TITLE |
2014-03-24 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(H.MLV) |
2014-03-24 | Senate | NR: MICCICHE |
2014-03-24 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, MEYER |
2014-03-24 | Senate | HSS RPT 2DP 1NR |
2014-03-14 | Senate | STEDMAN, EGAN, FRENCH, STEVENS, DUNLEAVY, MICCICHE, ELLIS, WIELECHOWSKI, DYSON |
2014-03-14 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): FAIRCLOUGH, GARDNER, BISHOP, MCGUIRE, COGHILL, GIESSEL, |
2014-03-12 | Senate | HSS, STA |
2014-03-12 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-03-10 | House | VERSION: CSHJR 25(MLV) |
2014-03-10 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-03-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ISAACSON, MILLETT, STOLTZE |
2014-03-10 | House | PASSED Y38 E2 |
2014-03-10 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 25(MLV) |
2014-03-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LYNN, GARA, TUCK, TARR, GUTTENBERG, JOSEPHSON |
2014-03-05 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/10 CALENDAR |
2014-03-05 | House | MLV CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-03-05 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-03-05 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/5/2014 |
2014-02-19 | House | FN1: ZERO(H.MLV) |
2014-02-19 | House | DP: GRUENBERG, HIGGINS, SADDLER, REINBOLD, HUGHES, LEDOUX, FOSTER |
2014-02-19 | House | MLV RPT CS(MLV) 7DP |
2014-02-03 | House | MLV |
2014-02-03 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |