AK HJR20 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-01 - 2:52 PM 7/1 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-01 - 2:52 PM 7/1 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the President of the United States and the United States Congress to repeal the excise tax on medical devices.
Title
Medical Device Tax
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Lynn [R] | Rep. Wes Keller [R] | Sen. Lora Reinbold [R] | Rep. Kurt Olson [R] |
Rep. Doug Isaacson [R] | Rep. Craig Johnson [R] | Rep. Gabrielle LeDoux [R] | Rep. Charisse Millett [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | House | 2:52 PM 7/1 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-04-14 | Senate | VERSION: HJR 20 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-14 | Senate | PASSED Y17 N3 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 20 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-14 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-14 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2014 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(H.HSS) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | NR: WIELECHOWSKI |
2014-03-21 | Senate | DP: DYSON, COGHILL, GIESSEL |
2014-03-21 | Senate | STA RPT 3DP 1NR |
2014-02-28 | Senate | STA |
2014-02-28 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-02-26 | House | VERSION: HJR 20 |
2014-02-26 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-02-26 | House | COSPONSOR(S): OLSON, ISAACSON, JOHNSON, LEDOUX, MILLETT |
2014-02-26 | House | PASSED Y29 N6 E5 |
2014-02-26 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 20 |
2014-02-26 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-02-26 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-02-26 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/26/2014 |
2014-02-12 | House | FN1: ZERO(H.HSS) |
2014-02-12 | House | NR: TARR, SEATON |
2014-02-12 | House | DP: NAGEAK, KELLER, HIGGINS |
2014-02-12 | House | HSS RPT 3DP 2NR |
2014-01-27 | House | COSPONSOR(S): REINBOLD |
2014-01-21 | House | HSS |
2014-01-21 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |