AK HJR2 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Const. Am: Approp Limit
Title
Const. Am: Approp Limit
Sponsors
Rep. Will Stapp [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2023-04-20 | House | FN1: ZERO(GOV) |
2023-04-20 | House | AM: GROH |
2023-04-20 | House | NR: MCKAY, GRAY |
2023-04-20 | House | DP: MCCABE, TILTON, CARPENTER |
2023-04-20 | House | W&M RPT CS(W&M) 3DP 2NR 1AM |
2023-03-01 | House | FN1: ZERO(GOV) |
2023-03-01 | House | AM: EASTMAN, VANCE |
2023-03-01 | House | NR: GRAY |
2023-03-01 | House | DNP: GROH |
2023-03-01 | House | DP: C.JOHNSON, CARPENTER, ALLARD |
2023-03-01 | House | JUD RPT CS(JUD) 3DP 1DNP 1NR 2AM |
2023-01-30 | House | JUD REFERRAL ADDED BEFORE W&M |
2023-01-23 | House | W&M, FIN |
2023-01-23 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |