AK HJR18 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Hearing: May 7 @ 3:30 pm in Beltz 105 (tsbldg)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Hearing: May 7 @ 3:30 pm in Beltz 105 (tsbldg)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Social Security Benefit Reduction Repeal
Title
Social Security Benefit Reduction Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-01 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-05-01 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-05-01 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS |
2024-05-03 | Senate | STA |
2024-05-03 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2024-05-01 | House | VERSION: CSHJR 18(STA) |
2024-05-01 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2024-05-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GROH, SADDLER, JOSEPHSON, ORTIZ, GRAY, CRONK, WRIGHT, TILTON |
2024-05-01 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2024-05-01 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 18(STA) |
2024-05-01 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2024-05-01 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y1 N39 |
2024-05-01 | House | STA CS ADOPTED UC |
2024-05-01 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2024-05-01 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/1/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HANNAN |
2024-03-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER |
2024-03-13 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SUMNER, ALLARD, STORY |
2024-03-13 | House | FN1: ZERO(H.STA) |
2024-03-13 | House | DP: WRIGHT, CARPENTER, C.JOHNSON, ALLARD, CARRICK, STORY, SHAW |
2024-03-13 | House | STA RPT CS(STA) 7DP |
2024-03-11 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HIMSCHOOT, ARMSTRONG, MINA, SCHRAGE, MEARS |
2024-03-06 | House | COSPONSOR(S): C.JOHNSON |
2024-02-07 | House | COSPONSOR(S): DIBERT |
2024-01-22 | House | STA |
2024-01-22 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Employment
Intergovernmental Relations
Law Enforcement
Military
Public Employees
Retirement
Social Security
Teachers
Intergovernmental Relations
Law Enforcement
Military
Public Employees
Retirement
Social Security
Teachers