AK HCR26 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-14 - PERMANENTLY FILED 7/14 LEGIS RESOLVE 37
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-14 - PERMANENTLY FILED 7/14 LEGIS RESOLVE 37
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commending the State of Israel for its cordial and mutually beneficial relationship with the United States and Alaska; and supporting the right of the State of Israel to self-governance and self-defense.
Title
Commending And Supporting State Of Israel
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - House: HCR 26 Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - House: HCR 26 Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-14 | House | PERMANENTLY FILED 7/14 LEGIS RESOLVE 37 |
2014-07-01 | House | 2:52 PM 7/1 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-04-08 | Senate | VERSION: HCR 26 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-08 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N1 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2014-04-07 | Senate | HELD TO 4/8 CALENDAR |
2014-04-07 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-07 | Senate | TAKEN UP |
2014-04-07 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK |
2014-04-04 | House | VERSION: HCR 26 |
2014-04-04 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-04-04 | House | PASSED Y36 E3 A1 |
2014-04-04 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG)(SUBMITTED BY RLS) |
2014-04-04 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-04 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/4/2014 |
2014-03-27 | House | RLS |
2014-03-27 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |