AK HB295 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to salmon hatchery permits; and authorizing the sale of salmon to permitted persons for stocking lakes.
Title
Salmon Hatchery Permits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-03-27 | House | FN1: ZERO(DFG) |
2024-03-27 | House | NR: MEARS, ARMSTRONG, DIBERT, MCCABE, SADDLER, WRIGHT |
2024-03-27 | House | DP: BAKER, RAUSCHER, MCKAY |
2024-03-27 | House | RES RPT CS(RES) NEW TITLE 3DP 6NR |
2024-03-13 | House | RES REFERRAL ADDED AFTER FSH |
2024-03-11 | House | FN1: ZERO(DFG) |
2024-03-11 | House | NR: C.JOHNSON, HIMSCHOOT, MCCORMICK |
2024-03-11 | House | DP: CARPENTER, STUTES, MCCABE, VANCE |
2024-03-11 | House | FSH RPT CS(FSH) NEW TITLE 4DP 3NR |
2024-01-26 | House | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2024-01-26 | House | FN1: ZERO(DFG) |
2024-01-26 | House | FSH |
2024-01-26 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |