AK HB286 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): HUGHES
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): HUGHES
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to victim restitution and compensation.
Title
Crime Victim Restitution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): HUGHES |
2024-03-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS |
2024-03-15 | Senate | STA |
2024-03-15 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2024-03-14 | House | VERSION: CSHB 286(STA) |
2024-03-14 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2024-03-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ARMSTRONG, CRONK, SCHRAGE, TILTON |
2024-03-14 | House | PASSED Y39 E1 |
2024-03-14 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 286(STA) |
2024-03-13 | House | COSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER, SADDLER, RUFFRIDGE, JOSEPHSON, VANCE |
2024-03-13 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/14 CALENDAR |
2024-03-13 | House | AM NO 2 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN |
2024-03-13 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y1 N39 |
2024-03-13 | House | STA CS ADOPTED UC |
2024-03-13 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2024-03-13 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): C.JOHNSON |
2024-02-28 | House | FN1: ZERO(AJS) |
2024-02-28 | House | DP: WRIGHT, CARPENTER, C.JOHNSON, ALLARD, CARRICK, STORY, SHAW |
2024-02-28 | House | STA RPT CS(STA) 7DP |
2024-02-19 | House | COSPONSOR(S): CARPENTER, STORY |
2024-02-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): CARRICK |
2024-02-12 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HIMSCHOOT |
2024-02-09 | House | COSPONSOR(S): WRIGHT |
2024-01-24 | House | STA |
2024-01-24 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |