AK HB23 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on October 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/18/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on October 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/18/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing the month of October as Filipino American History Month.
Title
Filipino American History Month
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-16 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/18/23 |
2023-10-16 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/20 CHAPTER 18 SLA 23 |
2023-10-16 | House | 3:10 P.M. 7/11/23 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-05-12 | Senate | VERSION: HB 23 |
2023-05-12 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2023-05-12 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- A1 |
2023-05-12 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): HUGHES, SHOWER, KAUFMAN, GIESSEL, OLSON |
2023-05-12 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 23 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/12 CAL |
2023-05-11 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2023-05-11 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/11/23 |
2023-05-05 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED) |
2023-05-05 | Senate | DP: KAWASAKI, WIELECHOWSKI, BJORKMAN, MERRICK |
2023-05-05 | Senate | STA RPT 4DP |
2023-04-03 | Senate | WIELECHOWSKI, TOBIN, KIEHL, DUNBAR, STEVENS |
2023-04-03 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GRAY-JACKSON, MERRICK, CLAMAN, BISHOP, KAWASAKI, |
2023-04-03 | Senate | STA |
2023-04-03 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2023-03-31 | House | VERSION: HB 23 |
2023-03-31 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2023-03-31 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FIELDS, JOSEPHSON, STUTES, TILTON |
2023-03-31 | House | PASSED Y36 E4 |
2023-03-31 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 23 |
2023-03-31 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2023-03-31 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2023-03-31 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/31/2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ |
2023-03-17 | House | ARMSTRONG, GRAY, GALVIN |
2023-03-17 | House | SUMNER, SHAW, CRONK, D.JOHNSON, MEARS, STORY, TOMASZEWSKI, MCCORMICK, |
2023-03-17 | House | COSPONSOR(S): RUFFRIDGE, EDGMON, CARPENTER, FOSTER, PRAX, COULOMBE, ALLARD, |
2023-03-17 | House | FN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED) |
2023-03-17 | House | DP: STORY, WRIGHT, C.JOHNSON, CARPENTER, ALLARD, SHAW |
2023-03-17 | House | STA RPT 6DP |
2023-02-27 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GROH |
2023-02-08 | House | COSPONSOR(S): WRIGHT |
2023-02-06 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE |
2023-01-30 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HIMSCHOOT |
2023-01-19 | House | STA |
2023-01-19 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2023-01-19 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/23 |