UT HB0069 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute English Language Arts Instructional Tool
Title
Substitute English Language Arts Instructional Tool
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 39 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 39 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2015-03-12 | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House | |
2015-03-12 | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House | |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar Table |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Education Committee |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Education Committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Education Committee |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2015-02-04 | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate | |
2015-02-03 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2015-02-03 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2015-02-03 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2015-01-29 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2015-01-29 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Education Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in House Education Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Education Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Education Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in House Education Committee |
2015-01-27 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Education Committee |
2015-01-26 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Education Committee |
2015-01-26 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2015-01-26 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Clerk of the House | |
2015-01-14 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House | |
2015-01-06 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House | |
2014-12-23 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2014-12-22 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |