US SB223 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-02-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-02-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Controlled Substances Act to fix a technical error in the definitions.
Title
A bill to amend the Controlled Substances Act to fix a technical error in the definitions.
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-02-06 | House | Received in the House. |
2023-02-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S192; text: CR S192) |
Same As/Similar To
HB455 (Same As) 2023-02-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.