TN HB1815 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Failed in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Failed in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes a pilot program for five years to allow private entities to provide foster care services to qualifying children; requires the department of children's services to create a process for selecting children for the program; directs the pilot program to submit monthly reports to the state foster care review board; requires the comptroller to audit the program. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 36 and Title 37.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 36 and Title 37, relative to foster care.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Butler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | Failed in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2024-01-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee - Government Operations for Review |
2024-01-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1840 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee