RI S0346 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To Elections (would Join Rhode Island In An Agreement Among States To Elect The President And Vice President By National Popular Vote)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To Elections (would Join Rhode Island In An Agreement Among States To Elect The President And Vice President By National Popular Vote)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-11SenateSigned by Governor
2013-07-05SenateTransmitted to Governor
2013-07-02HouseSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2013-07-02HousePlaced on Senate Calendar (07/02/2013)
2013-07-01SenateHouse passed Sub A
2013-07-01SenatePlaced on House Calendar (07/01/2013)
2013-07-01SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2013-07-01SenateScheduled for consideration (07/01/2013)
2013-06-13SenateReferred to House Judiciary
2013-06-13SenateSenate read and passed
2013-06-11SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/13/2013)
2013-06-11SenateCommittee recommends passage
2013-06-07SenateScheduled for consideration (06/11/2013)
2013-02-28SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2013-02-21SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2013)
2013-02-13SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback