Oklahoma Recently Introduced Bills
Browse Legislation - State Dashboard - View Trending
Bill | Summary | Last Action |
---|---|---|
HR1052 | House Resolution; Superintendent of Public Instruction; Ryan Walters; conduct; special investigation committee; membership; procedures; subpoena; documents; report. | 2024-05-29 Authored by Representative Munson |
SR45 | Resolution; relating to protection of property and supplies of the Senate and duties of the President Pro Tempore during the interim. | 2024-05-30 Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State |
HCR1018 | Establishing a legislative procedure schedule for the 60th Oklahoma Legislature. | 2024-05-30 Filed with Secretary of State |
SCR25 | Concurrent resolution; declaring 2024 as the Year of the Bible in Oklahoma. | 2024-05-30 Introduced |
HB4157 | Higher Learning Access Trust Fund; authorizing transfers; effective date; emergency. | 2024-05-30 Approved by Governor 06/14/2024 |
SB2039 | Attorney General; creating the Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Services Revolving Fund; providing for grants. Effective date. Emergency. | 2024-06-14 Approved by Governor 06/14/2024 |
HR1051 | Child Care Providers; declaring May 27, 2024 through June 2, 2024, Provider Appreciation Week. | 2024-05-23 Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State |
SR44 | Resolution; recognizing the KTEN Weather Team for their coverage of tornadic weather events occurring in south-central Oklahoma on April 27-28, 2024; and directing distribution. | 2024-05-28 Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State |
HR1050 | Recognizing May 12 through May 18, 2024, as National Police Week and recognizing May 15, 2024, as Peace Officers Memorial Day in the State of Oklahoma. | 2024-05-14 Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State |
HJR1060 | State Department of Education; approving rules; distribution. | 2024-05-14 |
HJR1061 | State Department of Education; approving certain rules; disapproving certain rules; distribution. | 2024-05-14 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules Committee |
HR1048 | A resolution recognizing May 6 through May 12 as Teacher Appreciation Week; celebrating the work of teachers in Oklahoma. | 2024-05-08 Authored by Representative Waldron |
HR1049 | A Resolution recognizing May 6 through May 12 as Teacher Appreciation Week; celebrating the work of teachers in Oklahoma. | 2024-05-13 Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State |
HR1047 | Resolution advocating for amending the Oklahoma Constitution to require proof of citizenship for voter registration. | 2024-05-14 Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State |
HR1046 | A Resolution recognizing May 6 through May 12 as National Nurses Week; celebrating the impact of nurses in Oklahoma. | 2024-05-09 Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State |
HJR1059 | Approving certain proposed permanent rules of state agencies; disapproving certain rules; distribution. | 2024-05-07 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules Committee |
SB2038 | Multiple versions of statutes; amending, merging, consolidating and repealing multiple versions of statutes. Emergency. | 2024-06-14 Approved by Governor 06/14/2024 |
HR1045 | Resolution designating the second week in May as Lung Cancer Action Week. | 2024-05-08 Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State |
HR1044 | Resolution; National Crime Victims' Rights Week; distribution. | 2024-04-29 Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State |
HCR1016 | Concurrent Resolution; Coach John Smith; recognition. | 2024-04-25 Filed with Secretary of State |
HCR1017 | Concurrent Resolution; mascot Pistol Pete; recognition. | 2024-04-25 Filed with Secretary of State |
HR1042 | Resolution; World Health Organization; United Nations; World Economic Forum. | 2024-04-25 Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State |
HR1043 | A Resolution to raise awareness for grandparents' visitation rights; and recognizing that grandparents are integral to their grandchildren's lives. | 2024-04-25 Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State |
SR43 | Resolution; recognizing Oklahoma's beef farmers and ranchers; designating May as Oklahoma Beef Month. | 2024-05-02 Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State |
SCR24 | Resolution; praising Oklahoma's food banks; recognizing April 22, 2024 as Anti-Hunger Day in Oklahoma; and directing distribution. | 2024-04-23 Filed with Secretary of State |
SR42 | Resolution; congratulating the Oklahoma City Blue for winning | 2024-04-22 Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State |
SR41 | Resolution; memorializing the 29th anniversary of the bombing of the Alfred P. Murrah Federal Building. | 2024-04-22 Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State |
SCR23 | Concurrent Resolution; recognizing May as Asian/Pacific American Heritage Month. | 2024-05-02 Filed with Secretary of State |
SR39 | Resolution; recognizing April 21-27, 2024, as National Crime Victims' Rights Week; recognizing and supporting victims' rights; reaffirming commitment to protecting the rights of all crime victims; and directing distribution. | 2024-04-29 Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State |
SR40 | Resolution; recognizing April as Sexual Assault Awareness Month and April 24, 2024, as Denim Day; supporting Peace Over Violence and the YWCA. | 2024-04-25 Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State |
HR1041 | A Resolution raising awareness for ovarian cancer; and recognizing the Month of September as National Ovarian Cancer Awareness Month. | 2024-05-08 Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State |
HR1040 | Resolution; Child Abuse Prevention Month. | 2024-04-23 Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State |
HCR1015 | Recognize establishment of OSU Extension; impact on Oklahoma; designating the 16th of April as a celebration. | 2024-04-17 First Reading |
HB4156 | Immigration; legislative intent; making certain acts unlawful; codification; effective date; emergency. | 2024-04-30 Approved by Governor 04/30/2024 |
HR1038 | Resolution; Oklahoma Beef Month; Oklahoma Beef Day at the Capitol. | 2024-05-02 Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State |
HR1039 | Resolution; 4-H Day at the Capitol. | 2024-04-18 Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State |
HR1037 | Resolution; Alfred P. Murrah Federal Building; remembrances; distribution. | 2024-04-16 Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State |
SCR22 | Concurrent resolution; proclaiming November 23, 2024 as Oklahoma Native American Warrior Day; encouraging Oklahomans to participate; and directing distribution. | 2024-05-02 Filed with Secretary of State |
HR1035 | A Resolution congratulating the University of Oklahoma Sooners softball team for winning the 2023 NCAA Women's College World Series. | 2024-04-04 Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State |
HR1034 | A Resolution recognizing and honoring Barry Switzer for his many contributions to the University of Oklahoma and the State of Oklahoma; distribution. | 2024-04-04 Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State |
SR38 | Resolution; recognizing Coach Barry Switzer's distinguished career. | 2024-04-08 Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State |
SR36 | Resolution; congratulating the 2023 University of Oklahoma women's gymnastics team; expressing appreciation for the exemplary manner in which they represented the University of Oklahoma and the state of Oklahoma. | 2024-04-08 Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State |
SR37 | Resolution; congratulating OU Softball and Coach Patty Gasso; expressing appreciation for their representation of the university and state. | 2024-04-08 Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State |
HR1036 | A Resolution congratulating the University of Oklahoma women's gymnastics team for winning the 2023 National Collegiate Athletic Association's women's gymnastics national title. | 2024-04-04 Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State |
SCR21 | Concurrent resolution; honoring the life and distinguished career of Lieutenant General Thomas P. Stafford; and directing distribution. | 2024-04-04 Filed with Secretary of State |
SR35 | Resolution; declaring April 16, 2024, as Oklahoma Agriculture Day; recognizing and celebrating agriculture's impact on our state's heritage and economy; and directing distribution. | 2024-04-17 Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State |
HR1033 | Honoring Derrick L. Shepard; April 8 as Derrick Shepard Day. | 2024-04-09 Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State |
SR33 | Resolution; honoring the life of former Senator Donald Forrest Ferrell; recognizing his public service in elected office and as a member of the United States Air Force and Air National Guard; remembering his time as Oklahoma's Adjutant General and ap... | 2024-03-28 Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State |
SR34 | Resolution; honoring the life and distinguished career of Lt. General Thomas P. Stafford; and directing distribution. | 2024-03-25 Authored by Senator Jech |
HR1032 | Resolution; National Poetry Month. | 2024-04-03 Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State |