NH SB194 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB194
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-18 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 01/18/2024; Senate Journal 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-18 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 01/18/2024; Senate Journal 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing students under age 21 to taste wine in educational settings.
Title
Allowing students under age 21 to taste wine in educational settings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-18 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-18 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 01/18/2024; Senate Journal 2 |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 01/18/2024; Senate Journal 2 |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Sen. Soucy Moved Reconsideration on vote of Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/18/2024; Senate Journal 2 |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 01/18/2024, Vote 3-1; Senate Calendar 3 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Special Order to Next Session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 01/03/2024; Senate Journal 1 |
2023-12-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 01/03/2024, Vote 3-1; Senate Calendar 49 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2023; Senate Journal 8 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 02/22/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Hearing: 01/31/2023, Room 100, State House, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB194 (Carry Over) 2023-02-22 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2023; Senate Journal 8