NE LB150 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB150 amended into LB867 by AM2262
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB150 amended into LB867 by AM2262
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the sale of natural gas by metropolitan utilities districts and exempt certain purchases of energy and fuel from sales tax
Title
Change provisions relating to the sale of natural gas by metropolitan utilities districts and exempt certain purchases of energy and fuel from sales tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB150 amended into LB867 by AM2262 |
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-01-28 | Legislature | Revenue AM1711 filed |
2014-01-28 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1711 |
2014-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill. |
2013-02-06 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 13, 2013 |
2013-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2013-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=18659 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB150.pdf |